U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40015
  • Case Name: Luke B. Davis and Rochelle L. Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Withdraw Document]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.