U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10173
  • Case Name: Suzana Dawn Lamont
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Response]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.