U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10174
  • Case Name: Hansel Sebastian Mann
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.