U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20131
  • Case Name: Christina Renee Williams
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Support Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.