U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20099
  • Case Name: Vonda LaNeise Douglas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Generic Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.