U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20140
  • Case Name: South Regency Shops, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Compensation]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Quash]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [2004 Exam]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Withdraw Document]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [2004 Exam]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Continued (Motion)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Cash Collateral]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appointment of Creditor's Committee (UST Only)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Status Report]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.