U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05025
  • Case Name: Williamson v. Royal Legal Group LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 12, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Extend/Shorten Time]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • April 09, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 07, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 04, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Brief]
  • April 04, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 04, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.