U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20111
  • Case Name: JM Grove, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Order on Generic Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Chapter 11 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Resolving]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Support Document]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Continue Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Objection]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.