U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40259
  • Case Name: Susan Renee Farr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Request for Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order Setting Deadline for Submission of Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.