U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10171
  • Case Name: Leta Shay Ellen Womack
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.