U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10185
  • Case Name: Veleta Renel Oldfield
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employee Income Records]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.