U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-40066
  • Case Name: Nathan Daniel Hunt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Post-Confirmation Amendment of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw As Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.