U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10083
  • Case Name: Vasco Cesar Ferreira
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Flags Set-Reset]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Flags Set-Reset]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Final Financial Management Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedule C (Only)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Amended Schedule C]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.