U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20160
  • Case Name: Leslie Marchant Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Final Decree]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.