U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20130
  • Case Name: Jonathan E Flores
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Financial Management Course]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.