U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20116
  • Case Name: Zachary Tyler Shipps and Megan Elizabeth Shipps
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.