U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-04124
  • Case Name: Eucalyptus Real Estate, LLC v. LRS South, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motion Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.