U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-01002
  • Case Name: United States Department of Labor v. Mother's Finest, LTD.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.