U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-21456
  • Case Name: Fallon Amber Shepherd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Post-Confirmation Amendment of Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.