U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20139
  • Case Name: Nathan Donell Harrison and Heidi Michelle Wintholz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Debtor's Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.