U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20126
  • Case Name: Taylor Roland Bryan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Transfer of Claim - FEE]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.