U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40123
  • Case Name: Lacy Jordan Davison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employee Income Records]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.