U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20193
  • Case Name: Andre Kevin Lloyd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.