U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11307
  • Case Name: Passion Porche Yvonne Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Employ]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Hearing Continued (Other)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Continue Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Flags Set-Reset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Final Financial Management Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.