U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11120
  • Case Name: Laurie Lee Fenno
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Final Financial Management Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Flags Set-Reset]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Delay Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Approving Final Report & Account]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.