U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20250
  • Case Name: Chanice Michelle Peterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Change of Address]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Extend Automatic Stay - Granted]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.