U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21641
  • Case Name: William Ashley Wulfkuhle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.