U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20272
  • Case Name: Ryan Joseph Shaffer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Dismiss Case]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Allow Claims]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payment]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amend Plan (Post-Confirmation)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Compensation]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Modify Plan Payments]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.