U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11251
  • Case Name: David Ellsworth Sook and Cynthia Ann Sook
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Generic]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Report of Sale]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Sell]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Discharging Debtor(s)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.