U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-04023
  • Case Name: Matamoros v. MCI Communications Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • March 13, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 13, 2025: [State Court Records]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.