U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20036
  • Case Name: Michelle Leigh Warren
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Claim]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.