U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21592
  • Case Name: The Hasty Group, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Objection Deadline]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Compensation]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Objection to Claim]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Objection to Claim]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Affidavit]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Affidavit]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Generic]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Objection to Claim]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Objection Deadline]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Generic Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Chapter 11 Operating Report (Monthly, Small Business or Subchapter V, UST Form 425C)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Amended Chapter 11 Plan]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Messerli, Robbin L [Chapter 11 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.