U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40318
  • Case Name: David John Haefke and Ann Maureen Haefke
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Intended Compromise]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continue Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [D.Kan.LBR 3001.1(D)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Generic]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Report of Sale]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Notice of Closing Information]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Request for Closing Information]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Statement of Financial Affairs]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Sell]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Employ]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continue Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.