U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11155
  • Case Name: Brian Eduardo Raymundo-Verdin and Bibiana Karina Raymundo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Relief from Stay]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Withdraw Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Objection Deadline]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Continue Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hamilton, Patricia E [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.