U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05026
  • Case Name: Campus Credit Union v. Rhone
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 15, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Report of Parties Planning Meeting]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Service]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Clerk's Notice of Hearing (with form)]
  • March 17, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Summons Request]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Support Document]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.