U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10092
  • Case Name: Chandra Lansford and Kobey Lansford
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Trustee's Interim Report]
March, 2025
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.