U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10183
  • Case Name: Maria C Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Motion/Application]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Motion/Application]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Motion)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Administrative Expenses]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.