U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20158
  • Case Name: Benjamin Justin Canther
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Final Decree]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Withdraw Document]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Objection Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Relief from Stay]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.