U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40062
  • Case Name: Carl Gonzalez and Diane Elizabeth Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order Setting Deadline for Submission of Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Installment Payment (Not Final)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Abandon]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Relief from Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.