U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-40801
  • Case Name: Maggie Jo Brown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Returned Mail]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim (Late Assets)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Interim Report]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Objection Deadline]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Turnover]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Returned Mail]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Returned Mail]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, TR Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.