U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-10086
  • Case Name: Robert E Hurst
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Financial Management Course]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Intent]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Amended Schedules]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income 122A-1 (Formerly Chapter 7 Means Test)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule J]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule I]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Schedule A/B]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Redmond, Christopher J [Upon Converting Case To Chapter 7]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Conversion from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.