U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21614
  • Case Name: Kolin Scott Plush and Bethany Lynn Plush
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Retention of Tax Refund]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Retention of Tax Refunds]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdrawal of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.