U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11260
  • Case Name: Susan Ann Sterling and Travis Warren Wood
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Dismiss Case]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Resolving]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Clerk Notice of Claim Filed Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 501(c)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Motion)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Held (Other)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.