U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-11204
  • Case Name: Jason Deric Holder and Nina Marie Holder
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Withdraw Document]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.