U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40133
  • Case Name: Jasmine Lee Swain
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Request for Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Financial Management Course]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.