U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10037
  • Case Name: Lawrence Daniel Drimmel and Susanne Elizabeth Drimmel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 19, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Notice of Objection Deadline]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Correct Defective Pleading(s)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Schedules]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection Deadline]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.