U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40135
  • Case Name: Zane Joseph Steves and Kerri Christine Steves
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amendments to Schedules D, E, F, G or H]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Amended Schedules]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Request for Notice]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Employee Income Records]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Correct Voluntary Petition]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [AAutoAsignJudge7]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.