U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20307
  • Case Name: Belinda Denise Hollins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Order]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Filing Fee Payment Ch 13]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objecting To Discharge]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Flags Set-Reset]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Sheet]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Request for Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objecting to Discharge]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Expediting Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Employee Income Records]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.