U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-40009
  • Case Name: Cody James Cotney
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Flags Set-Reset]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Online Payment of Fee]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Order Requiring Payment of Filing Fee or Case May Be Dismissed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.