U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10090
  • Case Name: Shearod R Washington
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Final Decree]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Financial Management Course]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rebein, Steven R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.